skip to content

Dower, Andrea Mary

CPSO#: 89097

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Anaesthesia
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 8452571 Ext. 3581 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L9H 6X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 9055221155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 46698
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Dower Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dower ( CPSO# 89097 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General/Juravinski Cancer
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4N6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARY DOWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008