skip to content

Dove, John Frederick Claude

CPSO#: 27270

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 May 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dingwall Medical Group Box 3011 Dryden, Ontario P8N2Z6 Or Weenbayko General Hospital P O Box 34 Moose Factory, ON P0I 1W0 Or Sioux Lookout MenoYaWin Hospital 1 MenoYaWin Way Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1B4
Date Received: 22 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020