skip to content

Douglas, Carol Jean

CPSO#: 20861

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Boudreau, Carol Jean (used until: 15 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1999