skip to content

Douglas, Andrew Scott Dick

CPSO#: 95082

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 78044 Meriline
Nepean ON  K2E 1B1
Phone: 613-801-0035 Ext. 103
Fax: 613-212-8885 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.S.D. Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Douglas ( CPSO# 95082 )

Business Address:
PO Box 78044 Meriline
Nepean ON  K2E 1B1
Phone Number: (613) 801-0036

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT DICK DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013