skip to content

Doughty, Kathryn Suzanne

CPSO#: 91975

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tufts University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 13 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 May 2011