skip to content

Doufle, Ghislaine Yawavi

CPSO#: 97121

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2018
EXPIRY DATE
15 Aug 2025
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4645 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G Doufle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Doufle ( CPSO# 97121 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Critical Care Medicine
585 University Avenue
Suite 11 PMB 125
Toronto ON  M5B 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 19 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2025

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Ghislaine Yawavi Doufle may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia,  University of Toronto, in which Dr. Doufle holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Doufle no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Doufle's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Doufle's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 16, 2018.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 15, 2025.