skip to content

Doucette-Preville, David Eric

CPSO#: 91217

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015