skip to content

Doucet, Lorenne Suzanne

CPSO#: 86725

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 494-7435
Fax: (416) 494-4819 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sammy Sue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sue ( CPSO# 84709 )
Dr. L. Doucet ( CPSO# 86725 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORENNE SUZANNE DOUCET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009