skip to content

Doshi, Biraju

CPSO#: 94500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Highland Medical Center
475 Tecumseh Road E
Suite 3
Windsor ON  N8X 4W5
Phone: 5199152686
Fax: 5199152551 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chrysler W A P
2545 Chrysler Center
Windsor ON  N8N 5M5
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4302
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellete Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: (519) 254-3150
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Biraju Doshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Doshi ( CPSO# 94500 )

Business Address:
South Windsor Medical Center
Roseland Afterhours Clinic
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 969-3744

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Chrysler W A P
2545 Chrysler Center
Windsor ON  N8N 5M5
Phone Number: (519) 973-4302

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BIRAJU DOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013