skip to content

Almagor, Doron

CPSO#: 62437

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University Of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Possibilities Clinic
Suite 200
1920 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3E2
Phone: (416) 482-5558
Fax: (416) 482-8999 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Doron Almagor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Almagor ( CPSO# 62437 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
55 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1G8
Phone Number: (416) 482-5558

Business Address:
1920 Yonge St
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4S 3E2
Phone Number: 416-482-5558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DORON ALMAGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAGOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1992