skip to content

Doris, Christopher Ian

CPSO#: 30640

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Ian Doris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Wentworth-Halton XRay and Ultrasound 1 Young St Hamilton ON L8N 1T8 Phone: 905-572-6868
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:10 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019