skip to content

Dorian, Paul

CPSO#: 31433

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 6 - 027
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5152
Fax: (416) 864-5348 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL DORIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984