skip to content

Dorey, Michael Wayne

CPSO#: 85926

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Alberta Eye MD 103, 2731 Hewes Way Edmonton, Alberta T6L 6W6
Date Received: 01 Sep 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 05 Feb 2007 to 02 Mar 2007
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2020