skip to content

Dore, Marc Joseph Pierre

CPSO#: 89146

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
Phone: 6136321111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

1910 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 6136866656
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marc Dore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dore ( CPSO# 89146 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARC JOSEPH PIERRE DORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2012 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013