skip to content

Doran, Sean Thomas

CPSO#: 95389

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 77576 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sean Doran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Doran ( CPSO# 95389 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN THOMAS DORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016