skip to content

Doran, James Anthony

CPSO#: 27038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 6 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES ANTHONY DORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1974