skip to content

Doorly, Patrick Francis

CPSO#: 31192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Doorly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Doorly ( CPSO# 31192 )

Business Address:
302 - 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 737-1532

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Kevin Ali Suite 104 125 Bell Farm Rd Barrie ON L4N 6L2
Date Received: 03 Jun 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021