skip to content

Donovan, Kelly Anne

CPSO#: 86229

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Whately, Kelly Anne (used until: 10 Feb 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 77 Westmount Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 837-1848
Fax: (519) 837-2363 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly Donovan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Donovan ( CPSO# 86229 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
11 Speedvale Avenue East
Guelph ON  N1H 1J2
Phone Number: (519) 837-1848

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:14 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY ANNE DONOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009