skip to content

Donovan, Elysia Kathleen

CPSO#: 98772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 May 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
McMaster University
699 concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELYSIA KATHLEEN DONOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2019