skip to content

Donald, David Melville

CPSO#: 23637

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997