skip to content

Donald, Christopher Richard

CPSO#: 25964

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Donald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Donald ( CPSO# 25964 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021