skip to content

Donahoe, Laura Lynn

CPSO#: 94896

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
9N-950
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 6529
Fax: 415-340-4556 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Donahoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Donahoe ( CPSO# 94896 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-985
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth St
9N-950
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: 4164590393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:01 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA LYNN DONAHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 May 2011
EL - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
EL - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015