skip to content

Dominic, Arunmozhi

CPSO#: 91977

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2011 to 11 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2019