skip to content

Dombros, Nicholas

CPSO#: 27845

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jul 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Salonika, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2003