skip to content

Dolbear, Betty Edna

CPSO#: 24548

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Betty Dolbear Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2014