skip to content

Dolan, Michael Clifford

CPSO#: 27582

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Dolan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Dec 2019