skip to content

Doko, Magbule

CPSO#: 95244

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2285 Howard Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 3V2
Phone: (519) 254-7979
Fax: (519) 254-0488 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Doko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doko ( CPSO# 95244 )

Business Address:
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Phone Number: (519) 254-7979

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAGBULE DOKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014