skip to content

Doiron, Philip Rodney

CPSO#: 90580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Dept of Dermatology
76 Grenville St
5th Floor, Room 5222
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Dermatology
East Wing, 8th Floor
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5952
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Doiron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Doiron ( CPSO# 90580 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Dermatology
5th Floor, 5222
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
8th Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5952

Business Address:
589 King Street East
Suite 1
Toronto ON  M5A 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 419-4462

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP RODNEY DOIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014