skip to content

Doerksen, David Cornelius

CPSO#: 24467

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Mar 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David C. Doerksen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Windsor Regional Hospital 1995 Lens Ave. Windsor, ON N8W 1L9
Date Received: 22 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020