skip to content

Doell, Donald Matthew

CPSO#: 94546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Doell, Donald (used until: 16 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Geriatric Medicine
MUHC-Montreal General Hospital
1650 Cedar Avenue
Montreal, Quebec
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: (905) 934-1934 Ext. 34499

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Donald M. Doell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD MATTHEW DOELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Nov 2010
EL - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011