skip to content

Dodgson, Bruce Gordon

CPSO#: 29172

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bruce G. Dodgson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital For Sick Children, 555 University Avenue, Toronto, ON, M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016