skip to content

Dodds, Mark Cameron

CPSO#: 94496

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeview FHT
80 Catherine St.
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone: (613) 394-0770
Fax: 613-480-6586 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mark C. Dodds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dodds ( CPSO# 94496 )

Business Address:
Brighton Quinte West FHT
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone Number: (613) 394-0770


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jan 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active
 Dr.  Mark  Cameron  Dodds  may  practise medicine independently in Family
            Medicine, only.