skip to content

Dobson, Edmund Arthur

CPSO#: 12177

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Apr-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1942 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991