skip to content

Dobkin, Karen Jennifer

CPSO#: 98082

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9773 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen J. Dobkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dobkin ( CPSO# 98082 )

Business Address:
9600 Bathurst St
Suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER DOBKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 03 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2015