skip to content

Dobbs, Ryan Craig

CPSO#: 91159

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519 464 4400 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

239 George Street
Suite B
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P1
Canada
Phone: 519 491 2244
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dobbs and Nyholt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nyholt ( CPSO# 88366 )
Dr. R. Dobbs ( CPSO# 91159 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
239 George Street
Suite B
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P1
Phone Number: (519) 491-2244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN CRAIG DOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBBS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011