skip to content

Doan, Nam Dinh

CPSO#: 93240

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Nov 2020
EXPIRY DATE
11 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr Sudbury, ON P3E 1X3
Date Received: 11 Nov 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 2020