Doad, Ajinder Kaur (CPSO#: 97695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian, Urdu

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tower Hill Medical Centre
380 Tower HIll Road , Unit 17
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0T8
Phone: 289-475-6104
Fax: 905-770-9579
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9212 Yonge Medical Centre
9212 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 7A2
Canada
Phone: 289- 597-5596
Fax: 289-597-5515
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ajinder Doad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Doad ( CPSO# 97695 )

Business Address:
Unit 17
380 Tower Hill Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0T8
Phone Number: (289) 475-6104

Business Address:
Yonge Medical Center
9212 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 7A2
Phone Number: (289) 597-5596

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJINDER KAUR DOAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2014