skip to content

Dmytrash, Andrea Leanne

CPSO#: 99097

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Shores Medical Clinic
10 Maplewood Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone: (705) 478-0968
Fax: (705) 478-7347 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA LEANNE DMYTRASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DMYTRASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018