Dmetrichuk, Jennifer Michelle (CPSO#: 100345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 525 9140 Ext. 22183
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE DMETRICHUK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DMETRICHUK is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. DMETRICHUK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DMETRICHUK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DMETRICHUK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DMETRICHUK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DMETRICHUK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019