skip to content

Dlamini, Nomazulu

CPSO#: 89825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 2014
EXPIRY DATE
23 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7721
Fax: 416-813-6334 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:24 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Nomazulu Dlamini may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Pediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Dlamini holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Dlamini no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Dlamini's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Dlamini's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  September 24, 2014. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 23, 2021.