skip to content

Djuricic, Milla

CPSO#: 86131

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Nis, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jeanne d' Arc Medical Centre
Orléans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone: (613) 903-7563
Fax: (613) 903-7564 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Milla Djuricic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Djuricic ( CPSO# 86131 )

Business Address:
Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone Number: (613) 903-7563

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILLA DJURICIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJURICIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008