Djuric, Vladimir (CPSO#: 99378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Sep 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Silver Medical Group
Unit 9
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: 416-512-6375
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
McMaster University Medical Centre
4th Floor Yellow Section 4V
1200 Main St.
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42590
Fax: 905-577-8022
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Djuric Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 11 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Vladimir Djuric may practise medicine independently in interventional pain
            management, only.