skip to content

Dizon, Stephanie

CPSO#: 96724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Warwick, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H6P8
Phone: 9058292826
Fax: 9058292846 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 9058131100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DIZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 30 Aug 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Nov 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2016