skip to content

Dixon, Kirsten Michaele

CPSO#: 84592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E., 2nd floor
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Shared Care Clinical Outreach
CAMH
67 Adelaide St E.
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-9282
Fax: (416) 392-9771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN MICHAELE DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008