skip to content

Dirnberger, Walter

CPSO#: 15334

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Graz, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1955
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Oct 1994