skip to content

Dion, Marie Susanne

CPSO#: 92894

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: 905-641-5556
Fax: 905-641-7515 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Blanchard and Dion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blanchard ( CPSO# 103660)
Dr. M. Dion ( CPSO# 92894 )

Business Address:
Niagara Urology Associates
Unit 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 641-5556

Business Address:
Suite 201
21 Front Street South
Thorold ON  L2V 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 688-6460

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Welland Site
65 Third Street
St Catharines ON  L3B 4W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE SUSANNE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015