skip to content

Dion, Angie Karoline

CPSO#: 95127

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Ascent Medical Centre
Nepean ON  K2E 0B8
Phone: 613-221-5957
Fax: 613-714-6803 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. K. Dion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dion ( CPSO# 95127 )

Business Address:
202-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Nepean ON  K2E 0B8
Phone Number: 613-221-5957

Business Address:
Zoemed Clinic
106 - 460 West Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K2E 1B8
Phone Number: (613) 820-3694

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGIE KAROLINE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013