skip to content

Dinsmore, Michael John

CPSO#: 97964

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
McL - 2- 405
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Dinsmore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dinsmore ( CPSO# 97964 )

Business Address:
UHN- Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
MCL-2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN DINSMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINSMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2018