skip to content

Dinning, Stephen Ian

CPSO#: 90461

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN IAN DINNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2011 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2015