skip to content

Dingle, Brian Henry

CPSO#: 30575

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jan 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Dingle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre London Regional Cancer Program 790 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 4L6
Date Received: 26 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017